CA SB946 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 459, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 6.2 (commencing with Section 51036) to Part 1 of Division 1 of Title 5 of the Government Code, relating to sidewalk vendors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sidewalk vendors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-21 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB946 Lara et al. Concurrence (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Assembly - SB 946 Lara Senate Third Reading By GARCIA, E (Y: 56 N: 17 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB946 Lara et al (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-17 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 459, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-17 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-28SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2018-08-21SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 5546.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-21SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 17. Page 6396.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-16AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-06-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 20).
2018-06-11AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2018-05-10AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. GOV.
2018-05-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-03SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 10. Page 4939.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-04-24SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-23SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 4721.) (April 18).
2018-04-11SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2018-04-10SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2018-02-08SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2018-01-30SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 1.
2018-01-29SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code51036New CodeSee Bill Text
Vehicle Code21150New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback