CA SB942 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 988, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 988, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 75230 of the Public Resources Code, relating to transportation, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Low Carbon Transit Operations Program: free or reduced fare transit program.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Newman [D] | Sen. Susan Rubio [D] | Sen. Tom Umberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-23 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB942 Newman et al. Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-18 - Assembly - SB 942 Newman Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-08-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB942 Newman (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-18 - Assembly - SB 942 Newman Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-08-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB942 Newman (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 988, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5023.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-18 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5954.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-08-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 10). |
2022-07-29 | Assembly | August 3 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2022-06-09 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 3641.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3238.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing March 28. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 16. Noes 0. Page 3184.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Set for hearing March 22. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and E.Q. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 75230 | Amended Code | Citation Text |