CA SB942 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 109, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act relating to state claims, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State claims.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-05 - Assembly - SB 942 Lara Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB942 Lara Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-16 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 109, Statutes of 2018.
2018-07-16 Approved by the Governor.
2018-07-11SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-07-05SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-07-05AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 6108.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-06-28AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 27).
2018-06-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-29SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4334.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-23SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-22SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-05-16SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2018-02-08SenateReferred to Com. on APPR.
2018-01-30SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 1.
2018-01-29SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback