CA SB941 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 13, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 13, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to state claims, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
California Victim Compensation Board: claims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - Assembly - SB 941 Lara Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB941 Lara Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB941 Lara Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 13, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-05-17 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5134.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-05-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 2). |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4760.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4676.) (April 16). |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 1. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |