CA SB939 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-18 - June 18 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-18 - June 18 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1951.9 to, and to add and repeal Section 1951.10 of, the Civil Code, relating to evictions, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Emergencies: COVID-19: commercial tenancies: evictions.
Sponsors
Sen. Lena Gonzalez [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] | Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] |
Asm. Philip Ting [D] | Asm. Ash Kalra [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-18 | Senate | June 18 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Set for hearing June 18. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Set for hearing June 9. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3583.) (May 22). |
2020-05-13 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 22. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-03-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1951.10 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1951.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |