CA SB938 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 89, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 89, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 56375, 56824.14, 57002, 57075, 57077.1, 57077.2, 57077.3, 57077.4, and 57090 of, to add Sections 56375.1, 57077.5, and 57077.6 to, to add Chapter 4.5 (commencing with Section 57091) to Part 4 of Division 3 of Title 5 of, and to repeal Sections 57076, 57107, and 57113 of, the Government Code, and to amend Section 116687 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to local government.
Title
The Cortese-Knox-Hertzberg Local Government Reorganization Act of 2000: protest proceedings: procedural consolidation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB938 Hertzberg et al. Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Assembly - SB 938 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By Mayes (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB938 Hertzberg et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Assembly - SB 938 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By Mayes (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB938 Hertzberg et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 89, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-07-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-06-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. | |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4393.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-06-16 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5396.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-06-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-09 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-06-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 8). |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2022-04-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3495.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3292.) (March 31). |
2022-03-24 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Set for hearing March 31. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 56375 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 56375.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 56824.14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 57002 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 57075 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 57076 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 57077.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 57077.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 57077.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 57077.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 57077.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 57077.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 57090 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 57107 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 57113 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 116687 | Amended Code | Citation Text |