CA SB937 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-16 - From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (August 16).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 18941.12 to the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 1030, 1031, and 1033 of, and to add Sections 1034 and 1035 to, the Labor Code, relating to employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lactation accommodation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB937 Wiener et al (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation and Housing] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (August 16).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2018-08-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-06-07AssemblyReferred to Coms. on L. & E. and B. & P.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 6. Page 4401.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4299.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-14SenateMay 14 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2018-05-01SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 4821.) (April 24).
2018-04-19SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2018-04-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4721.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2018-04-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4626.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-03-16SenateSet for hearing April 11.
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Coms. on L. & I.R., JUD., and T. & H.
2018-01-26SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 25.
2018-01-25SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code18941.12New CodeSee Bill Text
Labor Code1030Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code1031Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code1033Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code1034New CodeSee Bill Text
Labor Code1035New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback