CA SB935 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-18 - June 18 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Sections 17053.81 and 23631 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Personal Income Tax Law: Corporation Tax Law: credits: educator housing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB935 Becker (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-18AssemblyJune 18 hearing postponed by committee.
2024-06-11AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2024-05-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2024-05-23AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2024-05-22SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4131.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2024-05-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2024-05-06SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2024-04-26SenateSet for hearing May 6.
2024-04-24SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2024-04-23SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3730.) (April 23).
2024-04-05SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2024-04-03SenateRe-referred to Com. on PUB S.
2024-03-20SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2024-02-14SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2024-01-17SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 16.
2024-01-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Revenue and Taxation Code17053.81Repealed CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code23631Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback