CA SB933 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Com. on HUMAN S. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Com. on HUMAN S. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 50210, 50214, and 50215 of, and to add Sections 50213.5 and 50215.5 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Homeless Emergency Aid program: funding.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referral to Com. on HUMAN S. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar. |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on HOUSING and HUMAN S. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 50210 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 50213.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 50214 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 50215 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 50215.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB933 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB933 |