CA SB933 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-23 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 17 (commencing with Section 53080) to Part 28 of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Education Code, relating to visual and performing arts education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Visual and performing arts education: grant program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-28 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB933 Allen et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Assembly - SB 933 Allen Senate Third Reading By O'DONNELL (Y: 75 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB933 Allen et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-23 In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2018-09-23 Vetoed by the Governor.
2018-09-05SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2018-08-28SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5876.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-28SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-07-05AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-07-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27).
2018-06-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4401.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4299.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-04-23SenateApril 23 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2018-04-11SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4532.) (April 4).
2018-03-20SenateSet for hearing April 4.
2018-03-15SenateRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2018-03-01SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-08SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-01-26SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 25.
2018-01-25SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code53080New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback