CA SB929 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 408, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 408, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 6270.6 and 53087.8 to the Government Code, relating to special districts.
Title
Special districts: Internet Web sites.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-22 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB929 McGuire Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Assembly - SB 929 McGuire Senate Third Reading By BLOOM (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB929 McGuire (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Assembly - SB 929 McGuire Senate Third Reading By BLOOM (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB929 McGuire (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-14 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 408, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-14 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-28 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2018-08-22 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5604.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-21 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6402.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2018-07-02 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-07-02 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2018-04-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4760.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4676.) (April 16). |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4534.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 25. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 53085 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 53087.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 6270.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |