CA SB928 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 151, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 151, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 7666 of the Probate Code, relating to public administrators.
Title
Public administrators: compensation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-01 - Assembly - SB 928 Wieckowski Senate Third Reading By Kalra (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB928 Wieckowski (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB928 Wieckowski (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-15 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 151, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-08-15 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-05 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-01 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 64. Noes 0. Page 5709.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 1). |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3583.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3254.) (March 29). |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | (Ayes 31. Noes 6.) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Probate Code | 7666 | Amended Code | Citation Text |