CA SB923 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 859.7 to the Penal Code, relating to criminal procedure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal investigations: eyewitness identification.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB923 Wiener et al (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 8.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-04-23SenateApril 23 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2018-04-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4627.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-06SenateSet for hearing April 10.
2018-02-01SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-01-24SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 23.
2018-01-23SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code859.7New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback