CA SB922 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - April 10 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 5. Noes 5. Page 4604.) Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Senate Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - April 10 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 5. Noes 5. Page 4604.) Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Senate Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 11011.30 of the Government Code, and to add and repeal Sections 21080.40 and 21168.16 of the Public Resources Code, relating to state property.
Title
Surplus state property: affordable student housing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-10 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [04-10-2018]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 5 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 5 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | Senate | April 10 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 5. Noes 5. Page 4604.) Reconsideration granted. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18 in EQ. pending receipt. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on G.O. and EQ. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 23. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 11011.30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 56001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21080.40 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 21168.16 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |