CA SB919 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - April 26 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 0. Page 3518.) Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - April 26 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 0. Page 3518.) Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 21610.1 to the Business and Professions Code, and to add Sections 10851.7 and 24020 to the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: catalytic converters.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [04-26-2022]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Senate | April 26 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 0. Page 3518.) Reconsideration granted. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 3307.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and PUB. S. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | (Ayes 31. Noes 6.) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 6. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 21610.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 10851.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 24020 | New Code | See Bill Text |