CA SB918 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5)
Status: Passed on September 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 841, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 8257 of, and to add Chapter 7 (commencing with Section 8259) to Division 8 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to homeless youth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Homeless Youth Act of 2018.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB918 Wiener et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - SB 918 Wiener Senate Third Reading By RUBIO (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB918 Wiener et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Transportation and Housing] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-27 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 841, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-27 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-11SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6114.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-31SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-08-30SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6981.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-22AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-21AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on HUM. S.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4399.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 4299.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-07SenateMay 7 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-27SenateSet for hearing May 7.
2018-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 4821.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-18SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2018-04-12SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-04-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4624.) (April 10).
2018-03-06SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2018-02-06SenateSet for hearing April 10.
2018-02-01SenateReferred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and T. & H.
2018-01-23SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 22.
2018-01-22SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code13725New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code8257Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code8259New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback