CA SB918 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 89, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 89, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 301.9 to the Corporations Code, relating to mutual water companies.
Title
Mutual water companies: boards of directors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-07-01 - Assembly - SB 918 Anderson Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Senate - Special Consent #2 SB918 Anderson (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Senate - Special Consent #2 SB918 Anderson (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-15 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 89, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-07-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-07-07 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2011-07-01 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-07-01 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 0. Page 2163.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-06-29 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-06-28 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 27). | |
2011-05-19 | Referred to Com. on B. & F. | |
2011-05-09 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-05-09 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 907.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-04 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | |
2011-04-13 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-04-12 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 580.) (April 6). | |
2011-03-29 | Set for hearing April 6. | |
2011-03-10 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Corporations Code | 301.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |