CA SB917 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-11 - August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-11 - August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 66502 of, and to add Sections 66513.4, 66513.5, 66516.1, 66516.7, and 66516.8 to, the Government Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Seamless Transit Transformation Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Becker [D] | Asm. Bill Quirk [D] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Asm. Alex Lee [D] |
Asm. Marc Levine [D] | Asm. Kevin Mullin [D] | Asm. Philip Ting [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB917 Becker et al (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB917 Becker et al (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-11 | Assembly | August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-20 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 3. Page 3839.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3775.) (May 19). |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 1. Page 3520.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | (Ayes 31. Noes 6.) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 6. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 66502 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 66513.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 66513.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 66516.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 66516.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 66516.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |