CA SB917 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 620, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 620, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 530.5 to the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.
Title
Insurance policies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB917 Jackson Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Assembly - SB 917 Jackson Senate Third Reading By COOLEY (Y: 47 N: 22 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB917 Jackson (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Assembly - SB 917 Jackson Senate Third Reading By COOLEY (Y: 47 N: 22 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB917 Jackson (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 620, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-06 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 5956.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-28 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 47. Noes 22. Page 6734.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2018-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-07-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (June 27). |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | June 20 hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 5085.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 4884.) (April 25). |
2018-04-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on I., B. & F.I. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 22. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 530.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |