CA SB916 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 14132 and 14301.1 of, and to add Section 14197.9 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medi-Cal: health care services.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2020-03-09SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2020-02-12SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2020-02-04SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 5.
2020-02-03SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14132Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14197.9New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14301.1Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback