CA SB914 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 108, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 108, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 20146 of the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
Local agency contracts: construction manager at-risk construction contracts.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Asm. Tim Grayson [D] | Sen. John Moorlach [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-07-02 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB914 Dodd et al. Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - SB 914 Dodd Senate Third Reading By GRAYSON (Y: 57 N: 6 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB914 Dodd et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - SB 914 Dodd Senate Third Reading By GRAYSON (Y: 57 N: 6 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB914 Dodd et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 108, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-07-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-07-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5026.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-06-25 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 57. Noes 6. Page 5966.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13). |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2018-04-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4758.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4623.) (April 11). |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Set for hearing April 11. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | April 4 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 22. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Contract Code | 20146 | Amended Code | Citation Text |