CA SB912 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1367.667 to the Health and Safety Code, to add Section 10123.209 to the Insurance Code, and to add Section 14132.09 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Biomarker testing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Assembly - SB 912 Limón Senate Third Reading By Arambula (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB912 Limón et al. Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Special Consent SB912 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB912 Limón et al. Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Special Consent SB912 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | Senate | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. |
2022-09-29 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2022-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5326.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3930.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3774.) (May 19). |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3461.) (April 20). |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | (Ayes 31. Noes 6.) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 5. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1367.667 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.209 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14132.09 | New Code | See Bill Text |