CA SB909 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 262, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 262, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 27002 of the Vehicle Code, relating to emergency vehicles, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Emergency vehicles.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D] | Sen. Cathleen Galgiani [D] | Sen. Brian Jones [R] |
Asm. Devon Mathis [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 909 Dodd Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB909 Dodd et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB909 Dodd et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB909 Dodd et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB909 Dodd et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 262, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5278.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2020-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 10). |
2020-07-28 | Assembly | July 28 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2020-06-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3683.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 3622.) (May 29). |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 29. |
2020-03-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 5. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 27002 | Amended Code | Citation Text |