CA SB906 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-29 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 1.4 (commencing with Section 14045.10) to Chapter 7 of Part 3 of Division 9 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental health services and substance use disorder treatment: peer support specialist certification.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Assembly - SB 906 Beall Senate Third Reading By WALDRON (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB906 Beall et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB906 Beall et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-29 In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2018-09-29 Vetoed by the Governor.
2018-09-12SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
2018-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6150.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-31SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-08-31SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-22AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-21AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4399.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4299.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-14SenateMay 14 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2018-04-19SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-14SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4375.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-02-28SenateSet for hearing March 14.
2018-01-24SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-01-18SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 17.
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14045.10New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback