CA SB903 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 107, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 99270.8 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation Development Act: County of Stanislaus.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-28 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB903 Cannella et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - SB 903 Cannella Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB903 Cannella et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-16 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 107, Statutes of 2018.
2018-07-16 Approved by the Governor.
2018-07-05SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2018-06-28SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4974.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-06-18SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-06-14AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5822.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-06-12AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-06-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 11).
2018-05-31AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-04-19AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-04-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-04-09SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4578.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-04-04SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-04-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 4517.) (April 3).
2018-03-29SenateSet for hearing April 3.
2018-01-24SenateReferred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-01-17SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 16.
2018-01-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code99270.8New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback