CA SB901 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-05 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-05 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 8879.501 of the Government Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Transportation: bond funded projects: letter of no
Sponsors
Sen. Roy Ashburn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-05 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-03-19 | Set for hearing April 6. | |
2010-02-11 | To Com. on T. & H. | |
2010-01-27 | From print. May be acted upon on or after February 26. | |
2010-01-26 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_901&sess=0910&house=S |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0901-0950/sb_901_bill_20100126_introduced.html |