CA SB900 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 18, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 18, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal and add Section 12012.102 of the Government Code, relating to tribal gaming, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Tribal gaming: compact ratification.
Sponsors
Sen. Melissa Hurtado [D] | Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D] | Asm. Devon Mathis [R] | Asm. James Ramos [D] |
Asm. Rudy Salas [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-16 - Assembly - SB 900 Hurtado Third Reading Urgency By Aguiar-Curry (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB900 Hurtado et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB900 Hurtado et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 18, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-05-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-05-24 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2022-05-17 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | (Corrected May 17.) |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4709.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3582.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | (Ayes 31. Noes 6.) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 4. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12012.102 | New Code | See Bill Text |