CA SB90 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 20 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Sections 22950.6 and 22955.2 to the Education Code, and to add Sections 20825.1 and 20825.2 to the Government Code, relating to public employees’ retirement, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public employees’ retirement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Assembly - SB 90 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB90 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB90 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-06-20SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-06-20AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2019-06-20AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended.
2019-06-20AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2019-06-20AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2019-06-17AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-06-11AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-05-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-04-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-04-11SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 668.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-04-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-08SenateOrdered to second reading.
2019-04-08SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 582.)
2019-01-24SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2019-01-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code22950.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code22955.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code20825.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code20825.2New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback