CA SB9 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2008 - 25% progression
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 8543.9 to the Government Code, relating to the State Auditor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Auditor: duties.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-01 Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2009-05-12 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2009-01-29 To Com. on G.O.
2008-12-02 From print. May be acted upon on or after January 1.
2008-12-01 Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback