CA SB899 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-27 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Reyes.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-27 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Reyes.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 19819 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to gambling.
Title
California Gambling Control Commission: voting records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB899 G.O (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB899 G.O (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-27 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Reyes. |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 22). |
2022-06-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3671.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 3510.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | March 15 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Set for hearing March 15. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | (Ayes 31. Noes 6.) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 4. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19819 | Amended Code | Citation Text |