CA SB897 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - March 24 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - March 24 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 18140 of the Penal Code, relating to restraining orders.
Title
Temporary emergency gun violence restraining orders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | March 24 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Set for hearing March 24. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | March 17 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Set for hearing March 17. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 29. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 18140 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB897 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB897 |