CA SB897 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator McGuire.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 2060 of, and to add Sections 2061 and 2062 to, the Insurance Code, relating to residential property insurance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Residential property insurance: wildfires.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31SenateOrdered to inactive file on request of Senator McGuire.
2018-05-01SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 4884.) (April 25).
2018-03-23SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2018-03-15SenateRe-referred to Com. on INS.
2018-03-15SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-03-15SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-02-28SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on I., B. & F.I.
2018-01-24SenateReferred to Com. on I., B. & F.I.
2018-01-16SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 15.
2018-01-12SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Insurance Code2060Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code2061New CodeSee Bill Text
Insurance Code2062New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback