CA SB896 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 222, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 222, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4124.5 and 4291.5 of the Public Resources Code, relating to fire prevention.
Title
Wildfires: defensible space: grant programs: local governments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-11 - Assembly - SB 896 Dodd Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB896 Dodd et al (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB896 Dodd et al (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 222, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-08-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-17 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m. | |
2022-08-11 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5827.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 3). |
2022-06-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 3702.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3048.) (March 8). |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Set for hearing March 8. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | (Ayes 31. Noes 6.) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 4. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 4124.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 4291.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |