CA SB892 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 130102, 130108, 190000, 190001, 190003, 190005, 190100, 190101, 190103, 190300, 190302, 190303, 190304, 190305, 190306, 190307, 190307.5, 190308, 190309, 190310, 190311, 190312, 190313, 190314, 190315, 190316, 190318, 190319, 190320, 190321, 190322, and 190323 of, to amend the heading of Division 20 (commencing with Section 190000) of, to amend and renumber Sections 190102, 190200, 190201, and 190202 of, to add the headings of Article 1 (commencing with Section 190000), Article 2 (commencing with 190100), and Article 3 (commencing with 190300) to Chapter 1 of Division 20 of, to add Chapter 2 (commencing with Section 190500) to Division 20 of, to repeal Sections 130054 and 130102.5 of, to repeal the headings of Chapter 2 (commencing with Section 190100), Chapter 3 (commencing with Section 190200), and Chapter 4 (commencing with Section 190300) of Division 20 of, and to repeal and add the heading of Chapter 1 (commencing with Section 190000) of Division 20 of, the Public Utilities Code, and to amend Section 149.11 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Transportation: San Bernardino County Transportation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From committee without further action. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 20. |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_892&sess=1516&house=S |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0851-0900/sb_892_bill_20160120_introduced.html |