CA SB89 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 1, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 1, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend the Budget Act of 2020 (Chapters 6 and 7 of the Statutes of 2020) by adding Items 2240-002-0890 and 2240-102-0890 to, and amending Section 39.00 of, that act, relating to the state budget, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, budget bill.
Title
Budget Act of 2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-28 - Assembly - SB 89 Skinner Senate Third Reading By REYES (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB89 Skinner Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB89 (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB89 Skinner Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB89 (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 1, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-01-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-01-28 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 119.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 232.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-01-26 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-01-25 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-01-25 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-01-25 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 14. Page 200.) |
2021-01-25 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-01-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-01-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 2. Page 90.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 22. Noes 8. Page 76.) |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Read first time. |
2020-12-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 16. |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |