CA SB89 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 2, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend the Budget Act of 2019 (Chapters 23 and 55 of the Statutes of 2019) by amending Section 39.00 of, adding Item 3970-002-001 to Section 2.00 of, and adding Sections 36.00 and 37.00 to, that act, relating to the state budget, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, budget bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Budget Act of 2019.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-16 - Assembly - SB 89 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB89 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB89 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 2, Statutes of 2020.
2020-03-17 Approved by the Governor.
2020-03-17SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
2020-03-16SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 3409.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2020-03-16Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 3409.)
2020-03-16SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2020-03-16AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 4336.) Ordered to the Senate.
2020-03-16Assembly(Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 4336.)
2020-03-16AssemblyArticle IV Sec. 8(b)(2) of the Constitution waived.
2020-03-16AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-03-16AssemblyOrdered to second reading.
2020-03-16Assembly(Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 4334.)
2020-03-16AssemblyArticle IV Sec. 8(b)(1) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2020-03-16AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2020-03-16AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-05-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-04-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-04-11SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 667.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-04-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-08SenateOrdered to second reading.
2019-04-08SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 582.)
2019-01-24SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2019-01-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback