CA SB889 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 208.5, 602, 603, 604, 605, 606, 607, 607.2, 607.3, 625.1, 626, 626.5, 628, 628.1, 630, 631, 631.1, 632, 634, 634.6, 635.1, 636, 654.1, 654.2, 654.3, 725, 726, 727, 729.5, 750, 777, 778, 790, and 826 of, to add Sections 636.01, 724, 774, and 790.1 to, and to repeal Sections 654.6, 729, 729.1, 729.3, 729.6, 729.7, 729.8, and 729.9 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juveniles: Juvenile court jurisdiction.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-25SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2020-02-06SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2020-01-27SenateRead first time.
2020-01-27SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 26.
2020-01-24SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code208.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code602Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code603Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code604Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code605Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code606Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code607Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code607.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code607.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code625.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code626Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code626.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code628Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code628.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code630Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code631Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code631.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code632Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code634Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code634.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code635.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code636Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code636.01New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code654.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code654.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code654.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code654.6Repealed CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code724New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code725Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code726Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code727Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code729Repealed CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code729.1Repealed CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code729.3Repealed CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code729.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code729.6Repealed CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code729.7Repealed CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code729.8Repealed CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code729.9Repealed CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code750Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code774New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code777Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code778Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code790Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code790.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code826Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback