CA SB886 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 663, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 663, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 21080.58 of the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality.
Title
California Environmental Quality Act: exemption: public universities: university housing development projects.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Wiener [D] | Sen. Bob Archuleta [D] | Sen. Josh Becker [D] | Sen. Benjamin Hueso [D] |
Asm. Jose Medina [D] | Asm. Kevin Mullin [D] | Asm. Robert Rivas [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB886 Wiener et al. Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-22 - Assembly - SB 886 Wiener Senate Third Reading By Robert Rivas (Y: 70 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB886 Wiener et al (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-22 - Assembly - SB 886 Wiener Senate Third Reading By Robert Rivas (Y: 70 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB886 Wiener et al (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 663, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-24 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 5081.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-22 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 70. Noes 2. Page 6009.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-18 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | June 29 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 13). |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 1. Page 3881.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3773.) (May 19). |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-05-16 | Senate | May 16 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3540.) (April 27). |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | April 25 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | (Ayes 31. Noes 6.) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 27. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 21080.58 | New Code | See Bill Text |