CA SB885 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 2782 and 2782.8 of the Civil Code, relating to contracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Contracts: design professionals: indemnity.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB885 Wolk (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-11-30AssemblyFrom Assembly without further action.
2016-11-30AssemblyFrom committee without further action.
2016-07-12AssemblyJune 28 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2016-06-16AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2016-06-09AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2016-06-02AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2016-06-01SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 4. Page 4076.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2016-05-10SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2016-05-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3766.) (May 3).
2016-04-21SenateSet for hearing May 3.
2016-04-18SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2016-01-28SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2016-01-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 19.
2016-01-19SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code2782Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code2782.8Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback