CA SB884 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 819, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 819, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 8385 of, and to add Section 8388.5 to, the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.
Title
Electricity: expedited utility distribution infrastructure undergrounding program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Assembly - SB 884 McGuire Senate Third Reading By Mullin (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB884 McGuire Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB884 McGuire (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB884 McGuire Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB884 McGuire (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 819, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 5325.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69 suspended. |
2022-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (August 11). |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2022-06-27 | Assembly | June 27 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2022-06-13 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2022-06-09 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on U. & E. and NAT. RES. |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 3. Page 3835.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3773.) (May 19). |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3459.) (April 20). |
2022-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3413.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20 in GOV. & F. pending receipt. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | April 21 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 21 in GOV. & F. pending receipt. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Referral to Com. on E.Q. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on E., U. & C., GOV. & F., and E.Q. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | (Ayes 31. Noes 6.) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 26. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 8385 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 8388.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |