CA SB882 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 167, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 167, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 640 of the Penal Code, relating to crimes.
Title
Crimes: public transportation: minors.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D] | Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Sen. Bob Wieckowski [D] | Asm. Matt Dababneh [D] |
Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-04 - Assembly - SB 882 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By JONES-SAWYER (Y: 45 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB882 Hertzberg (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB882 Hertzberg (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 167, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-08-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2016-08-04 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 45. Noes 29. Page 5717.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-06-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 28). |
2016-06-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 4127.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3998.) (May 27). |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | April 25 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2016-04-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3521.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 12. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR. |
2016-01-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 18. |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 640 | Amended Code | Citation Text |