CA SB881 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 454.52 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.
Title
Load-serving entities: integrated resource plans.
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Min [D] | Sen. Josh Becker [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Senate | May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-05-16 | Senate | May 16 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | April 25 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | April 18 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3237.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Set for hearing March 28. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | March 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Set for hearing March 14. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | (Ayes 31. Noes 6.) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 26. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 454.52 | Amended Code | Citation Text |