CA SB881 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 685, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 12749.99 to the Water Code, relating to flood control.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Flood control: County of Santa Clara: South San Francisco Bay Shoreline Project.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-28 - Assembly - SB 881 Wieckowski Senate Third Reading By CHU (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Special Consent SB881 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-22 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 685, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-22 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-10SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-30SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6061.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-29SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-08-28SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-28AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-23AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-23AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-06-21AssemblyAssembly Rule 56 suspended.
2018-06-19AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
2018-06-11AssemblyReferred to Coms. on W.,P., & W. and JUD.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4451.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4298.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-07SenateMay 7 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-27SenateSet for hearing May 7.
2018-04-26SenateApril 30 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-04-20SenateSet for hearing April 30.
2018-04-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4722.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-03SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-03-29SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2018-03-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 4366.) (March 13). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-02-23SenateSet for hearing March 13.
2018-01-24SenateReferred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and JUD.
2018-01-12SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11.
2018-01-11SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Water Code12749.99New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback