CA SB881 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 779, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 779, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 42008.8 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: violations: payment of fines and bail.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB881 Hertzberg Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-31 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-30 - Assembly - SB 881 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By LOW (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-19 - Assembly - SB 881 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By A.,E.,S.,T.,& I.M. Amendment Set #1 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB881 Hertzberg (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-31 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-30 - Assembly - SB 881 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By LOW (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-19 - Assembly - SB 881 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By A.,E.,S.,T.,& I.M. Amendment Set #1 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB881 Hertzberg (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 779, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-09 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2016-08-31 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on T. & H. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5549.) Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 5607.) Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5576.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6478.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 29). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-24 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2016-08-19 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Ayes 48. Noes 23. Page 5945.) Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5968.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (August 11). |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 28). |
2016-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and PUB. S. |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 7. Page 4037.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3998.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-05-09 | Senate | May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-05-02 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3612.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2016-04-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3523.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 12. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and PUB. S. |
2016-01-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 18. |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1214.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1463.007 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 12807 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 12808 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 13365 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 13365.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 13365.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 40508 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 40509 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 40509.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 42008.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |