CA SB881 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 65040.2 of, and to add Section 65040.7 to, the Government Code, relating to land use planning.
Title
Land use planning: renewable energy projects: siting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-16 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-31 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2011-05-26 | Held in committee and under submission. | |
2011-05-20 | Set for hearing May 26. | |
2011-05-16 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-05-06 | Set for hearing May 16. | |
2011-05-03 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-04-29 | Set for hearing May 9. | |
2011-04-27 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 763.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-25 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2011-04-04 | Set for hearing April 27. | |
2011-03-31 | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2011-03-22 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65040.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65040.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |