CA SB88 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 27, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 27, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 116680, 116681, 116682, and 116684 to the Health and Safety Code, to add and repeal Sections 21080.08, 21080.45, and 21080.46 of the Public Resources Code, and to amend Sections 375, 375.5, 377, 1058.5, 1552, 1846, 5103, and 5104 of, to add Sections 377.5, 79708.5, and 79716.5 to, and to add Article 3 (commencing with Section 1840) to Chapter 12 of Part 2 of Division 2 of, the Water Code, relating to water, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Water.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-06-19 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SB88 Committee on Budget an d Fiscal ReviewBy Leno (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-19 - Assembly - SB 88 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading By WEBER (Y: 52 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB88 Committee On B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-19 - Assembly - SB 88 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading By WEBER (Y: 52 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB88 Committee On B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 27, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-06-24 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:30 a.m. |
2015-06-19 | Senate | Unanimous consent granted to take up without reference to file. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 1512.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-06-19 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-06-19 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 28. Page 2054.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 382.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to second reading. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-01-12 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11. Read first time. |
2015-01-09 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 116680 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 116681 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 116682 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 116684 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 21080.08 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21080.45 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21080.46 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 1058.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 1552 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 1846 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 375 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 375.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 377 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 377.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 5103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 5104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 79708.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 79716.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |