CA SB879 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 690, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Sections 12440.6 and 12440.7 to the Government Code, relating to state employees, making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State employees: memoranda of understanding.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2014-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 3 SB879 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) Concurrence (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-29 - Assembly - SB 879 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading By SKINNER (Y: 60 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-08-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB879 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-09-27 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 690, Statutes of 2014.
2014-09-27 Approved by the Governor.
2014-09-09SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
2014-08-29SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Senate Rule 29.4 suspended. (Ayes 22. Noes 11. Page 4999.) Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4999.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2014-08-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 60. Noes 12. Page 6713.) Ordered to the Senate.
2014-08-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 19. Noes 9.) (August 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2014-08-27AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2014-08-26AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2014-08-25AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 6380.)
2014-08-22AssemblyRead third time and amended. (Page 6341.) Ordered to third reading.
2014-08-18AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2014-08-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 10.) (August 14).
2014-08-11AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5975.)
2014-05-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2014-04-10AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2014-04-10SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 3137.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2014-04-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2014-04-03SenateWithdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
2014-01-23SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2014-01-10SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 9.
2014-01-09SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code12440.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code12440.7New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_879&sess=1314&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0851-0900/sb_879_bill_20140109_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0851-0900/sb_879_bill_20140822_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0851-0900/sb_879_bill_20140826_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0851-0900/sb_879_bill_20140827_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0851-0900/sb_879_bill_20140905_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0851-0900/sb_879_bill_20140927_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0851-0900/sb_879_vote_20140410_1058AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0851-0900/sb_879_vote_20140814_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0851-0900/sb_879_vote_20140828_000005_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0851-0900/sb_879_vote_20140829_0436PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0851-0900/sb_879_vote_20140829_1157PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback