CA SB878 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member McCarty.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member McCarty.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 33319.4 of the Education Code, relating to school transportation.
Title
Drivers of unaccompanied minors: workgroup.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB878 Skinner et al (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB878 Skinner et al (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-29 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member McCarty. |
2022-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29). |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 1. Page 3835.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3773.) (May 19). |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | April 25 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3271.) (March 30). |
2022-03-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing March 30. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | March 9 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Set for hearing March 9. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2880.) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | (Ayes 31. Noes 6.) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 25. |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 33319.4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |