CA SB878 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-30 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-30 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Part 5.1 (commencing with Section 14460) to Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Office of the Transportation Inspector General.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB878 DeSaulnier Concurrence (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-30 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-27 - Assembly - SB 878 DeSaulnier Senate Third Reading By LOWENTHAL (Y: 51 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-22 - Assembly - SB 878 DeSaulnier Senate Third Reading By LOWENTHAL Amend By LOWENTHAL Set #1 (Y: 52 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Transportation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB878 DeSaulnier (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-30 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-27 - Assembly - SB 878 DeSaulnier Senate Third Reading By LOWENTHAL (Y: 51 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-22 - Assembly - SB 878 DeSaulnier Senate Third Reading By LOWENTHAL Amend By LOWENTHAL Set #1 (Y: 52 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Transportation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB878 DeSaulnier (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-30 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2012-09-30 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2012-09-11 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2012-08-31 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5082.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-08-30 | Set for hearing August 30. From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 5043.) | |
2012-08-29 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on T. & H. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4923.) Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2012-08-28 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2012-08-27 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 28. Page 6345.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-08-22 | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 6088.) Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-20 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-16 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16). | |
2012-08-09 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-08-06 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-07-05 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (July 3). | |
2012-07-02 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2012-06-28 | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5520.) | |
2012-06-27 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-06-25 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |
2012-06-13 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |
2012-06-04 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2012-04-26 | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and NAT. RES. | |
2012-01-26 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-01-26 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 2720.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-01-23 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-01-19 | Set for hearing January 19. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 2686.) (January 19). | |
2012-01-17 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-01-12 | Set for hearing January 17. | |
2012-01-11 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 2641.) (January 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-12-15 | Set for hearing January 10. | |
2011-06-09 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 14460 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 66536.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 24409 | Amended Code | Citation Text |