CA SB876 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Part 2.2 (commencing with Section 53.8) to Division 1 of the Civil Code, and to add Section 11139.2 to, the Government Code, relating to homelessness.
Title
Homelessness.
Sponsors
Sen. Carol Liu [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-05 - Senate - Reconsideration granted (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 2 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 2 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From committee without further action. |
2016-04-11 | Senate | April 12 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 12. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | April 5 hearing: Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3396.) |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. (Reconsideration vote only). |
2016-03-30 | Senate | March 29 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 7. Page 3336.) |
2016-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2016-03-07 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and JUD. |
2016-01-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 14. |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 53.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 11135 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 11139.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |